Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 06/10/2021 at 20:04:11 (UTC).

DIX, KATHY vs. DIX, MATTHEW

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 DIX, KATHY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DIX, MATTHEW. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Keith F White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************45-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Keith F White

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KATHY DIX

Respondent

MATTHEW DIX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ALISHIA MCDONALD

Respondent Attorney

NATASHA BOSTICK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: BOSTICK, NATASHA P; Amount: -295.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 295.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketAnswer & Counter Claim/Counter Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketAcceptance of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketLetter Requesting Filing Fee from Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: MCDONALD, ALISHIA WOODARD; Amount: -408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Social Security

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketPetition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketAmended Administrative Temporary Order Provided to Customer

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOSTICK, NATASHA P