This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 11/26/2021 at 15:55:19 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANKvs.LISA D FRANZESE

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 DISCOVER BANKvs LISA D FRANZESE was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Carly S Wish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************74-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Carly S Wish

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

LISA D FRANZESE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISTINE FICKER

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Unserved; Comments: Unserved/No Contact Lisa D Franzese

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Order Following Pre-Trial Conference

Order Following Pre-Trial Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil - Caraballo, Tina L (Actual: Caraballo, Tina L); Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Following Pre-Trial Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Caraballo, Tina L (Actual: Caraballo, Tina L)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved; Comments: Unserved/No Contact Lisa D Franzese

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Charlene Doss; Amount: -310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less