This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 12/31/2021 at 15:39:05 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANKvs.KEVIN J HARDER

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 DISCOVER BANKvs KEVIN J HARDER was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael Deen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************02-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Michael Deen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

KEVIN J HARDER

Orlando, FL 32819-5213

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRETT BURKETT

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Emailed Atty

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: KEVIN J HARDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial; Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: KEVIN J HARDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Emailed Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Brett Burkett; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURKETT BRETT H