This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 11/26/2021 at 16:06:31 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANKvs.AIMEE R MERRITT

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 DISCOVER BANKvs AIMEE R MERRITT was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************52-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

AIMEE R MERRITT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISTINE FICKER

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Notice to Appear

Notice to Appear; Comments: emailed to atty

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: SERVED 10/08/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial; Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: SERVED 10/08/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear; Comments: emailed to atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Charlene Doss; Amount: -310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less