This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/03/2019 at 15:32:48 (UTC).

DILEO, HEATHER vs. MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 DILEO, HEATHER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Patricia L Strowbridge. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************51-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Patricia L Strowbridge

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HEATHER DILEO

Defendant

MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANE JORDAN

Defendant Attorney

JEFFREY DEFELICE

 

Court Documents

Request for Copies

Request for Copies

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s); Comments: of Heather DiLeo

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s); Comments: JESSE JAMES

Notice of Production of Non-Party

Notice of Production of Non-Party

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 4-7.10(g) OF THE RULES REGULATION THE FLORIDA BAR

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Complaint

Complaint

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: JURY TRIAL

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition(s); Comments: of Heather DiLeo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition(s); Comments: JESSE JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Production of Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply to Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 4-7.10(g) OF THE RULES REGULATION THE FLORIDA BAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: JORDAN, DANE ERLING; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less