This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 11/21/2022 at 16:05:06 (UTC).

DIAGNOSTIC RADIOLOGY CENTER OF THE TREASURE COAST vs. PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 DIAGNOSTIC RADIOLOGY CENTER OF THE TREASURE COAST filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy J Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************75-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Amy J Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DIAGNOSTIC RADIOLOGY CENTER OF THE TREASURE COAST

BIANCA SPANO AAO

AJAY K. GOYAL M.D. INC DBA

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JESSICA PICKERAL

Defendant Attorney

REBECCA BENCH

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Addendum to

Addendum to

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: To Respond to Complaint and Discovery

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: To Respond to Complaint and Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Jessica Pickeral; Amount: -310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIAGNOSTIC RADIOLOGY CENTER TREASURE COAST INC is a litigant

Latest cases where AJAY K. GOYAL, M.D., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant