This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 07/16/2022 at 15:34:50 (UTC).

DEVILLE, MAGALIEvs.CIU LIU DESIGNS LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 DEVILLE, MAGALIEvs CIU LIU DESIGNS LLC was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kevin B. Weiss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************60-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kevin B. Weiss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAGALIE DEVILLE

Defendants

CIU LIU DESIGNS LLC

ROSS DRESS FOR LESS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ABOUBAKR MAAROUFI

Defendant Attorneys

MATTHEW BERNSTEIN

MICHAEL KRAFT

 

Court Documents

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Certificate of No Objection

Certificate of No Objection

Notice of Withdrawal

Notice of Withdrawal; Comments: Notice of Production from Non-Party

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT ROSS DRESS FOR LESS INC.,

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT CIU LIU DESIGNS LLC

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT ROSS DRESS FOR LESS INC.

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT CIU LIU DESIGNS, LLC

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT ROSS DRESS FOR LESS INC.

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT CIU LIU DESIGNS, LLC

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of No Objection

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal; Comments: Notice of Production from Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT ROSS DRESS FOR LESS INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT CIU LIU DESIGNS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT ROSS DRESS FOR LESS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT CIU LIU DESIGNS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT ROSS DRESS FOR LESS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT CIU LIU DESIGNS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROSS DRESS FOR LESS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATTHEW BERNSTEIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRAFT, MICHAEL