This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 01/24/2019 at 16:52:11 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY vs.MURRAY, BERNICE et al.

Case Summary

On 04/08/2016 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MURRAY, BERNICE. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LISA T MUNYON 43A and Lisa T Munyon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************88-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LISA T MUNYON 43A

Lisa T Munyon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY THE REGISTERED HOLDERS OF MORGAN STANLEY ABS CAPITAL I INC TRUST 2007 HE7 MORTGAGE PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2007 HE7 TRST

THE REGISTERED HOLDERS OF MORGAN STANLEY ABS CAPITAL I INC TRUST 2007 HE7 MORTGAGE PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2007 HE7 TRST

Defendants

BERNICE MURRAY

BERNICE MARR

PEOPLE OF LOCKHART COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BERNICE MARR

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BERNICE MURRAY

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BERNICE MURRAY BERNICE ELAINE MURRAY AKA

BERNICE MURRAY BERNICE ELAINE MURRAY AKA

BERNICE ELAINE MURRAY AKA

ALETHA W BLACKMON

CLIFFORD MARR

GLEN A MARR

KENNETH MARR

UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES GRANTEES AGAINST BERNICE MARR

POTENTIAL HEIR BENEFICIARY OF THE ESTATE OF BERNICE MARR DECEASED

LANCELOT HUGH MARR

LANCELOT H MARR AKA

KENNETH D MARR AKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONATHAN MEISELS

Defendant Attorneys

AARON SAOUD

ANDY TREUSCH

JASON TRACEY

JULIUS WILLIAMS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Joint Motion

Joint Motion; Comments: TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS

Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel

Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel

Notice of Dropping Parties

Notice of Dropping Parties

Notice for Trial Non-Jury

Notice for Trial Non-Jury

Order Setting Pre-Trial Conference

Order Setting Pre-Trial Conference; Comments: 2/13/17 at 9:30 am; Trial beginning 2/27/17

Witness and Exhibit List

Witness and Exhibit List

Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service; Comments: OF ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

133 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Disbursement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Title; Comments: Issued 1/23/2019 to MUPR 3 ASSETS, LLC. copy sent to recording and all parties. ck# 834276

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Sale; Comments: to MUPR 3 ASSETS, LLC - copy sent to all parties.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketMortgage Bid Balance; Comments: $182,489.00 WAS PAID - $2,844.00 Clerk fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBid Amount; Comments: $189,100.00 to 3rd party - $ 1,323.70 doc stamps, check #834276 provided

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketHEARING - Sale Date - Foreclosure, Sales

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Publication - Notice of Sale

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Sale; Comments: 1/9/19 ($70.00 post sale fee paid)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
147 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: Carlen Richbourg; Amount: -191944.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 191944.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: DAVID SCHNEID; Amount: -70.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 70.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN; Amount: -70.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 70.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN; Amount: -67.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 67.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: JONATHAN IAN MEISELS; Amount: -955.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 955.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less