This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 12/02/2019 at 15:33:32 (UTC).

DESROSIERS, JULES Jet al. vs. WEBBER , GRANT R, M.D.et al.

Case Summary

On 10/03/2019 DESROSIERS, JULES J filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against WEBBER , GRANT R, M D. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Luis F Calderon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************96-O

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Luis F Calderon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE STATUTORY SURVIVING CHILDREN OBO

MALACHAI ELIJAH KERNS

JULES J DESROSIERS

DARROLL KHALIL-WRIGHT

THE ESTATE OF KIM MARIE JEFFERSON-WRIGHT PREP

Defendants

FLORIDA HOSPITAL DBA

WINTER PARK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL DBA

FLORIDA CARDIOLOGY PA

CENTRAL FLORIDA PULMONARY GROUP PA

FLORIDA HOSPITAL MEDICAL GROUP INC

RUEL B GARCIA MD

ADVENT HEALTH MEDICAL GROUP RADIOLOGY AT CENTRAL FLORIDA DBA

ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM SUNBELT INC

RADIOLOGY SPECIALISTS OF FLORIDA FKA

GRANT R WEBBER MD

RAVIPRASAD G SUBRAYA MD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALAN LANDERMAN

Defendant Attorneys

PHILIP WALLACE

ZACHARY TRAPP

MICHAEL ESTES

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to attorney

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to attorney

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to attorney

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to attorney

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to attorney

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to attorney

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to attorney

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: and designation of email addresses

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition or Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: and/or motion to strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: to plaintiff's complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition or Motion to Strike; Comments: Defendants, GRANT R. WEBBER, M.D. and FLORIDA HOSPITAL MEDICA GROUP, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: LANDERMAN, ALAN JAY; Amount: -70.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 70.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: Winter Park National Bank; Amount: -405.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 405.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less