This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/17/2019 at 15:33:36 (UTC).

DELGADO, SULEIKA IVETTE vs. FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 12/19/2018 DELGADO, SULEIKA IVETTE filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kevin B. Weiss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************55-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kevin B. Weiss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SULEIKA IVETTE DELGADO

Defendant

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRENT WIKGREN

Defendant Attorney

JOHN GLENN

 

Court Documents

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: jury trial

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply to Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: jury trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Brent S Wikgren; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less