This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 10/18/2020 at 03:50:44 (UTC).

DELAURA, DANIEL MICHAEL, JR vs. RUTT, KATIE ANN

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 DELAURA, DANIEL MICHAEL, JR filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against RUTT, KATIE ANN. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Heather L Higbee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************56-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Heather L Higbee

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DANIEL MICHAEL DELAURA JR

Respondent

KATIE ANN RUTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LYNN WRIGHT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketAffidavit of Service Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketAffidavit of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Supplemental Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNotification of Rejection of Confidential Filing Request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Lynn Walker Wright PA; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketBirth Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Compliance

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Social Security

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCopy or Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketPetition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketAmended Administrative Temporary Order Provided to Customer

    Read MoreRead Less