Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 01/29/2019 at 15:39:59 (UTC).

DELANO YINKA vs. ROBERDS JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 11/30/2018 DELANO YINKA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ROBERDS JOSEPH. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric H DuBois. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************70-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DELANO YINKA

Defendants

ROBERDS JOSEPH

ROBERDS JOSEPH SR AKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL DAVIS

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Issued

Writ of Possession Issued; Comments: Emailed to Atty

Final Judgment

Final Judgment

Verification of Claim & Non-Military Service

Verification of Claim & Non-Military Service; Comments: ( RESIDENTIAL EVICTION) DEFENDANT(S) ROBERDS JOSEPH AKA ROBERDS JOSEPH SR

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: ROBERDS JOSEPH AKA ROBERDS JOSEPH SR

Motion for Default

Motion for Default; Comments: FINAL JUDGMENT POSSESSION ONLY (RESIDENTIAL EVICTION) DEFEBDABT(S) ROBERDS JOSEPH AKA ROBERDS JOSEPH SR

Motion for Final Judgment

Motion for Final Judgment; Comments: DEFAULT POSSESSION ONLY (Residential Eviction) against Defendant(s) ROBERDS JOSEPH AKA ROBERDS JOSEPH SR

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Complaint

Complaint

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing; Comments: *proposed*

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Comments: Emailed to Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Service Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Default Not Entered-Proposed Default was never submitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Verification of Claim & Non-Military Service; Comments: ( RESIDENTIAL EVICTION) DEFENDANT(S) ROBERDS JOSEPH AKA ROBERDS JOSEPH SR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Service; Comments: ROBERDS JOSEPH AKA ROBERDS JOSEPH SR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Default; Comments: FINAL JUDGMENT POSSESSION ONLY (RESIDENTIAL EVICTION) DEFEBDABT(S) ROBERDS JOSEPH AKA ROBERDS JOSEPH SR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Final Judgment; Comments: DEFAULT POSSESSION ONLY (Residential Eviction) against Defendant(s) ROBERDS JOSEPH AKA ROBERDS JOSEPH SR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Mailing; Comments: *proposed*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Mike G Davis; Amount: -195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIS, MICHAEL