This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 06/20/2022 at 15:32:50 (UTC).

DECHANT, GLORIANNvs.DISNEY VACATION CLUB MANAGEMENT LLC

Case Summary

On 04/21/2022 DECHANT, GLORIANNvs DISNEY VACATION CLUB MANAGEMENT LLC was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Reginald K Whitehead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************25-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Reginald K Whitehead

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GLORIANN DECHANT

Defendants

WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS US INC

DISNEY VACATION CLUB MANAGEMENT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAUL PERKINS

Defendant Attorney

THOMAS BROWN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Summons Issued

Summons Issued; Comments: emailed to attorney

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Summons Issued on Amended Complaint

Summons Issued on Amended Complaint; Comments: Emailed to attorney

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued on Amended Complaint; Comments: Emailed to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: PERKINS, PAUL CARTWRIGHT; Amount: -10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued; Comments: emailed to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: .; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISNEY VACATION CLUB MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS US INC DBA MAGIC is a litigant