This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 04/16/2021 at 16:13:17 (UTC).

DB ORLANDO COLLISION INCvs.STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/15/2021 DB ORLANDO COLLISION INCvs STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Carly S Wish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************29-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Carly S Wish

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DB ORLANDO COLLISION INC

AVILES, DELIA AAO

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ABRAHAM OVADIA

Defendant Attorney

JOHANNA CLARK

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: FIRST TO PLAINTIFF

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: FIRST TO PLAINTIFF

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: THE COMPLAINT

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Addendum to

Addendum to

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: FIRST TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: FIRST TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Ovadia Law Group, P.A.; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DB ORLANDO COLLISION INC (ASSIGNEE OF REYES, MARIA) is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHANNA CLARK