Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/09/2021 at 16:08:25 (UTC).

DB ORLANDO COLLISION INCvs.GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 DB ORLANDO COLLISION INCvs GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Carly Sidra Wish and Carly S Wish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************93-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Carly Sidra Wish

Carly S Wish

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DB ORLANDO COLLISION INC

CLAREESE CHIN AAO

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ABRAHAM OVADIA

Defendant Attorney

LINDSEY TROWELL

 

Court Documents

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: OVADIA, ABRAHAM; Amount: -10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: per Admin order 2009-12-02, emailed sent to attorney. RE: Addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Ovadia Law Group, P.A.; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DB ORLANDO COLLISION INC (ASSIGNEE OF REYES, MARIA) is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trowell, Lindsey R