Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 01/28/2019 at 15:40:00 (UTC).

DAVID BRANDEL vs. JOANNA MACPHELEMY, TIMOTHY REYNOLDS

Case Summary

On 11/29/2018 DAVID BRANDEL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JOANNA MACPHELEMY, TIMOTHY REYNOLDS. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are David P Johnson and Evellen H Jewett. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************03-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

David P Johnson

Evellen H Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVID BRANDEL

Defendants

JOANNA MACPHELEMY

TIMOTHY REYNOLDS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRIAN WOLK

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Returned Posted

Writ of Possession Returned Posted

Returned Mail

Returned Mail

Returned Mail

Returned Mail

Writ of Possession Issued

Writ of Possession Issued; Comments: Emailed to Atty

Final Judgment

Final Judgment

Entry of Default as to 5 Day

Entry of Default as to 5 Day; Comments: emailed to atty

Motion for Default

Motion for Default; Comments: AGAINST JOANNA MACPHELEMY AND TIMOTHY REYNOLDS

Verification of Claim & Non-Military Service

Verification of Claim & Non-Military Service; Comments: JOANNA MACPHELEMY AND TIMOTHY REYNOLDS

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: TIMOTHY REYNOLDS

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: JOANNA MACPHELEMY

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Returned Posted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Returned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Returned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Comments: Emailed to Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Entry of Default as to 5 Day; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Default; Comments: AGAINST JOANNA MACPHELEMY AND TIMOTHY REYNOLDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Verification of Claim & Non-Military Service; Comments: JOANNA MACPHELEMY AND TIMOTHY REYNOLDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Service; Comments: TIMOTHY REYNOLDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Service; Comments: JOANNA MACPHELEMY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: BRANDEL, DAVID; Amount: -195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOLK, BRIAN