Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 01/01/2019 at 15:34:34 (UTC).

DANXIU LIN vs. OMAR TORRES SUAREZ

Case Summary

On 11/02/2018 DANXIU LIN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against OMAR TORRES SUAREZ. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric H DuBois. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************26-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANXIU LIN

Defendant

OMAR TORRES SUAREZ

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Returned Posted

Writ of Possession Returned Posted

Final Judgment

Final Judgment

Writ of Possession Issued

Writ of Possession Issued; Comments: ORG & COPY TO PLTF

Motion for Final Judgment

Motion for Final Judgment

Motion and Entry of Clerk Default

Motion and Entry of Clerk Default

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Summons Returned Posted

Summons Returned Posted

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service

Complaint

Complaint

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

Owners Authorization

Owners Authorization

Summons Issued

Summons Issued; Comments: original and copy handed to plaintiff

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: original and copy handed to plaintiff

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Returned Posted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Comments: ORG & COPY TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion and Entry of Clerk Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Non Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Posted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued; Comments: original and copy handed to plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: original and copy handed to plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: LIN; DANXIU; Amount: -5.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 5.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: LIN, DANXIU; Amount: -210.65

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 25.65

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less