This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/11/2021 at 21:09:35 (UTC).

DALLAS, TREVAURRIS QUINELLE vs. WARREN, REJAKEA OLEON

Case Summary

On 06/14/2020 DALLAS, TREVAURRIS QUINELLE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against WARREN, REJAKEA OLEON. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Diana M. Tennis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************23-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Diana M. Tennis

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TREVAURRIS QUINELLE DALLAS

Respondent

REJAKEA OLEON WARREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TIMOTHY TERRY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketOrder Denying

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketMotion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketAnswer Denying Allegations

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2020
  • DocketMotion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Timothy Terry; Amount: -310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2020
  • DocketPetition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2020
  • DocketAmended Administrative Temporary Order Provided to Customer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TIMOTHY TERRY