This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 05/08/2023 at 15:42:58 (UTC).

DAIMLER TRUST vs. H AND A TOWING AND RECOVERY LLC

Case Summary

On 03/09/2023 DAIMLER TRUST filed an Other lawsuit against H AND A TOWING AND RECOVERY LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth Gibson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************12-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth Gibson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAIMLER TRUST

Defendant

H AND A TOWING AND RECOVERY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAUL WILSON

Defendant Attorney

DAVID PEDERSEN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Wilson Law Firm Sout; Amount: -300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less