This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/03/2019 at 15:32:14 (UTC).

CYPRESS LAKES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC vs. SEPULVEDA, CHRISTOPHERet al.

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 CYPRESS LAKES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SEPULVEDA, CHRISTOPHER. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Lisa T Munyon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************41-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Lisa T Munyon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CYPRESS LAKES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS

CHRISTOPHER SEPULVEDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN DIMASI

 

Court Documents

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s); Comments: D - JD LAW VIOLATION LETTER DATED 05/25/2017 OF DECLARATION FOR CYPRESS LAKES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s); Comments: A - master declaration of covenants conditions and restrictions of cypress lakes

Answer

Answer

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s); Comments: C - FINAL NOTICE LETTER DATED 04/07/2016 TO HOMEOWNER / RESIDENT REGARDING VIOLATION

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s); Comments: F - UPS EXPRESS MAIL

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s); Comments: E - JD LAW LETTER DATED 12/07/2018 REGARDING PRESUIT MEDIATION COVER LETTER

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s); Comments: B - CYPRESS LAKES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC RULES AND REGULATION OCTOBER 2003

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Exhibit(s); Comments: F - UPS EXPRESS MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Exhibit(s); Comments: E - JD LAW LETTER DATED 12/07/2018 REGARDING PRESUIT MEDIATION COVER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Exhibit(s); Comments: D - JD LAW VIOLATION LETTER DATED 05/25/2017 OF DECLARATION FOR CYPRESS LAKES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Exhibit(s); Comments: C - FINAL NOTICE LETTER DATED 04/07/2016 TO HOMEOWNER / RESIDENT REGARDING VIOLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Exhibit(s); Comments: B - CYPRESS LAKES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC RULES AND REGULATION OCTOBER 2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Exhibit(s); Comments: A - master declaration of covenants conditions and restrictions of cypress lakes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Law Offices of John L. Di Masi, P.A.; Amount: -420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less