Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/09/2019 at 15:49:41 (UTC).

CV PEREZ CONSTRUCTION CORP vs. SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/08/2019 CV PEREZ CONSTRUCTION CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Faye L Allen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************15-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Faye L Allen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CV PEREZ CONSTRUCTION CORP

CVP MITIGATION DBA

ROBERTO SANTIAGO AAO

Defendants

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

SECURITY FIRST FLORIDA DBA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IMRAN MALIK

Defendant Attorney

NOAH PROSSER

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF S ORIGINAL COMPLAINT BY SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY D/B/A SECURITY FIRST FLORIDA

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: Notice of Service Process.

Notice to Appear

Notice to Appear; Comments: emailed to atty

Complaint

Complaint

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2019
  • HEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF S ORIGINAL COMPLAINT BY SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY D/B/A SECURITY FIRST FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Comments: Notice of Service Process.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Imran Ebrahim Malik; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CV Perez Construction Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Security First Florida is a litigant

Latest cases where Security First Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Malik, Imran E