This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/09/2023 at 19:28:30 (UTC).

CURRY, GARY LEON vs. ROUSH, CHRISTOPHER RAYet al.

Case Summary

On 12/29/2022 CURRY, GARY LEON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROUSH, CHRISTOPHER RAY. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************18-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARY LEON CURRY

Defendants

CHRISTOPHER RAY ROUSH

BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELISSA ALZATE

Defendant Attorney

HECTOR RAMIREZ

 

Court Documents

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: BrightView landscape services inc

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY ...

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

Notice of Compliance

Notice of Compliance; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: BrightView landscape services inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY ...

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: no rtn sum submitted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: ALZATE, MELISSA; Amount: -10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Compliance; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less