This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 07/14/2022 at 17:07:24 (UTC).

CUNMIT INCvs.NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/20/2022 CUNMIT INCvs NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric H DuBois. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************91-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CUNMIT INC DBA ORANGE BLOSSOM AUTO GLASS

CUNMIT INC

GEIGLI SOTO PEREZ AAO

ORANGE BLOSSOM AUTO GLASS DBA

Defendant

NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE JACOBSON

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Copy or Copies

Copy or Copies; Comments: OF ORANGE BLOSSOM AUTO GLASS INVOICE 1142-2059659

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Issued Summon to the Attorney

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: ELECTRONIC DELIVERY on Thursday, June 30, 2022 ACCEPTANCE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: ELECTRONIC DELIVERY on Thursday, June 30, 2022 ACCEPTANCE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Issued Summon to the Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: JACOBSON, LEE MICHAEL; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy or Copies; Comments: OF ORANGE BLOSSOM AUTO GLASS INVOICE 1142-2059659

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ORANGE BLOSSOM AUTO GLASS DBA is a litigant

Latest cases where CUNMIT INC is a litigant

Latest cases where National General Insurance Company is a litigant