This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 09/17/2018 at 16:54:46 (UTC).

COMPLETE WELLNESS MEDICAL CENTER INC vs. PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/10/2018 COMPLETE WELLNESS MEDICAL CENTER INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is David P Johnson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************08-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

David P Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COMPLETE WELLNESS MEDICAL CENTER INC

LISA BRANTON AAO

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JESSICA PICKERAL

 

Court Documents

Summary of Proceedings

Summary of Proceedings

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Emailed to atty

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Emailed to atty

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

02/26/2018
View Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/26/2018
View Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2018
View Court Documents

Summary of Proceedings

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2018

HEARING - Pre-Trial Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2018
View Court Documents

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2018
View Court Documents

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Emailed to atty

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2018
View Court Documents

Notice of Designation of Email Address

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2018
View Court Documents

Request to Produce

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2018
View Court Documents

Request for Admissions

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2018
View Court Documents

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2018
View Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2018
View Court Documents

Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2018

Case Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2018

Description: Payment; Payer: PICKERAL, JESSICA; Amount: -10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2018

Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2018

Description: Payment; Payer: Jessica Pickeral; Amount: -65.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2018

Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less