Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/15/2021 at 14:56:33 (UTC).

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLCvs.INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/22/2020 COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLCvs INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gisela T Laurent and Carly S Wish. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************86-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gisela T Laurent

Carly S Wish

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

INTEGRATIVE PHYSICAL MEDICINE OF METRO WEST LLC FKA

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLC

INTEGRATIVE PHYSICAL MEDICINE DBA

CORI HUTCHINSON AAO

Defendant

INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANS KENNON

Defendant Attorney

ROBERT KLASSMAN

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY,

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil; Location: Room 130.02 on the 1st Floor Pre-Trial Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNot of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Hans Kennon; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTEGRATIVE PHYSICAL MEDICINE OF METRO WEST LLC FKA is a litigant

Latest cases where COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Infinity Auto Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KENNON HANS