Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/14/2021 at 15:43:47 (UTC).

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLCvs.DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLCvs DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian F Duckworth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************18-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian F Duckworth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

INTEGRATIVE PHYSICAL MEDICINE OF EUSTIS LLC FKA

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLC

MELVIN MACK JR AAO

INTEGRATIVE PHYSICAL MEDICINE DBA

Defendant

DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANS KENNON

Defendant Attorney

KELLY BARNES

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Motion

Motion; Comments: TO DEEM DEFENDANT S REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF ADMITTED - DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery; Comments: DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

Privilege Log

Privilege Log

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed to atty

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Comments: TO DEEM DEFENDANT S REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF ADMITTED - DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery; Comments: DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrivilege Log

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Hans Kennon; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTEGRATIVE PHYSICAL MEDICINE OF EUSTIS LLC FKA is a litigant

Latest cases where COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Direct General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLY BARNES