Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/14/2021 at 23:37:39 (UTC).

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLCvs.CENTURY-NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/27/2020 COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLCvs CENTURY-NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Evellen H Jewett and Amy J Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************14-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Evellen H Jewett

Amy J Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLC

INTEGRATIVE PHYSICAL MEDICINE OF WINTER AKA

INTEGRATIVE PHYSICAL MEDICINE OF WINTER FKA

INTEGRATIVE PHYSICAL MEDICINE DBA

PETER WEINSTEIN AAO

Defendant

CENTURY-NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANS KENNON

Defendant Attorney

BRET DUBBERT

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed atty

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil; Location: Room 130.02 on the 1st Floor Pre-Trial Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNot of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Hans Kennon; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Century National Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dubbert, Bret E