Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/14/2021 at 19:00:02 (UTC).

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLC vs.PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/10/2020 COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Evellen H Jewett and Amy J Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************69-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Evellen H Jewett

Amy J Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARIA LOTITO AAO

INTERVENTIONAL ASSOCIATES OF LAKELAND DBA

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLC

INTERVENTIONAL ASSOCIATES OF LAKELAND LLC FKA

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANS KENNON

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

Notice of Settlement

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return 69895318; Comments: PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil; Location: Room 130.02 on the 1st Floor Pre-Trial Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Hans Kennon; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERVENTIONAL ASSOCIATES OF LAKELAND DBA is a litigant

Latest cases where COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KENNON HANS