Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/13/2021 at 22:21:17 (UTC).

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLC vs.INFINITY ASSURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY ASSURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Evellen H Jewett and Amy J Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************96-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Evellen H Jewett

Amy J Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLC

PATRICK FEND AAO

INTEGRATIVE PHYSICAL MEDICINE DBA

INTEGRATIVE PHYSICAL MEDICINE OF PARK LA AKA

Defendant

INFINITY ASSURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANS KENNON

Defendant Attorney

CRISTINA LOMBILLO

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change

Notice of Change; Comments: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: INFINITY ASSURANCE INS CO

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change; Comments: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil; Location: Room 130.02 on the 1st Floor Pre-Trial Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNot of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: INFINITY ASSURANCE INS CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Hans Kennon; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Infinity Assurance Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KENNON HANS