Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/14/2021 at 12:18:08 (UTC).

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLC vs.DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/03/2020 COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian F Duckworth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************16-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian F Duckworth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLC

INTEGRATIVE PHYSICAL MEDICINE DBA

EVAN GRAY AAO

INTEGRATIVE PHYSICAL MEDICINE OF WEST OR FKA

Defendant

DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANS KENNON

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL LIEBGOLD

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Privilege Log

Privilege Log

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: and notice of disclosure and designation of email

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: by deft Direct General Insurance Company

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses 69983394; Comments: - Direct General Insurance Company

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice to Appear

Notice to Appear; Comments: emailed to atty

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil; Location: Room 130.02 on the 1st Floor Pre-Trial Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrivilege Log

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNot of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: and notice of disclosure and designation of email

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: by deft Direct General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Hans Kennon; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Direct General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KENNON HANS