Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 04/20/2021 at 15:53:43 (UTC).

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLC vs. UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian F Duckworth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************78-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian F Duckworth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLC

INTEGRATIVE PHYSICAL MEDICINE OF EUSTIS LLC FKA

MICHAEL CITRO AAO

INTEGRATIVE PHYSICAL MEDICINE DBA

Defendant

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANS KENNON

Defendant Attorney

JUSTIN SEEKAMP

 

Court Documents

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: ADDENDUM

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Hans Kennon; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: ADDENDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTEGRATIVE PHYSICAL MEDICINE OF EUSTIS LLC FKA is a litigant

Latest cases where COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seekamp, Justin L.