This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 11/15/2022 at 16:06:47 (UTC).

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC vs. PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric H DuBois. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************91-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC

SKYLAR TIREY AAO

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALEXIS ROSENBERG

Defendant Attorney

ERICH VON UNRUH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Privilege Log

Privilege Log

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Petition or Motion to Strike

Petition or Motion to Strike

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrivilege Log

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition or Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less