This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 04/23/2023 at 15:49:46 (UTC).

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLC vs. PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/22/2023 COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeanette D Bigney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************29-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeanette D Bigney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLC

CURTIS MCCULLERS AAO

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANS KENNON

Defendant Attorney

REBECCA BENCH

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Addendum to

Addendum to

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: FILED BY DEFT, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND INITIAL DISCOVERY SERVED WITH COMPLAINT - PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND INITIAL DISCOVERY SERVED WITH COMPLAINT - PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: FILED BY DEFT, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Hans Kennon; Amount: -310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less