This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 07/23/2022 at 16:50:51 (UTC).

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC vs. GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Carly S Wish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************84-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Carly S Wish

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC

AMANDA MALTOS AAO

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALEXIS ROSENBERG

Defendant Attorney

STACIA GODKIN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Addendum to

Addendum to

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: THE PLAINTIFF OMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLC

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY on Tuesday, July 5, 2022

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY on Tuesday, July 5, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: THE PLAINTIFF OMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Alexis Rosenberg; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STACIA GODKIN