This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 07/22/2022 at 16:07:08 (UTC).

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC vs. GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/23/2022 COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric H DuBois. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************49-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC

GIANNA DESCALZO AAO

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALEXIS ROSENBERG

Defendant Attorney

SARAH TANYHILL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Motion for Temporary Relief

Motion for Temporary Relief

Petition or Motion to Strike

Petition or Motion to Strike; Comments: and plaintiff's reply

Petition or Motion to Strike

Petition or Motion to Strike; Comments: AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: Notice of Service Process of Summons

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Answer

Answer; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Summons Issued

Summons Issued; Comments: emailed to attorney

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Temporary Relief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition or Motion to Strike; Comments: and plaintiff's reply

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition or Motion to Strike; Comments: AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: Notice of Service Process of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARAH TANYHILL