This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 03/19/2022 at 15:52:17 (UTC).

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLC vs. FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************63-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLC

LIDIA CANO AAO

Defendant

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANS KENNON

Defendant Attorney

TAISHA EASTERLING

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: Served- FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: Served- FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Hans Kennon; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE A SUBSIDIARY OF FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EASTERLING , TAISHA