This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 11/14/2022 at 16:00:32 (UTC).

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC vs. ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************12-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC

ELLEN WIGGINS AAO

Defendant

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALEXIS ROSENBERG

Defendant Attorney

ANTHONY PARRINO

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Addendum to

Addendum to

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Complaint

Complaint

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Interrogatories

Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: NOTICE OF SERVICE PROCESS

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: ELECTRONIC DELIVERY on Tuesday, September 20, 2022 -ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: NOTICE OF SERVICE PROCESS

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: and Designation of Email Address

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Petition or Motion to Strike

Petition or Motion to Strike; Comments: Affirmative Defenses

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition or Motion to Strike; Comments: Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: and Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: NOTICE OF SERVICE PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: ELECTRONIC DELIVERY on Tuesday, September 20, 2022 -ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: NOTICE OF SERVICE PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Alexis Rosenberg; Amount: -185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant