This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 09/02/2022 at 17:10:24 (UTC).

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC vs. PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/09/2022 COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L Cameron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************78-O

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew L Cameron

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC

SHALEXIS ALLEN AAO

Defendant

PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALEXIS ROSENBERG

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Addendum to

Addendum to

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Complaint

Complaint

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: NOT ATTACHED- NOTICE OF SERVICE PROCESS

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION- ELECTRONIC DELIVERY- 8/17/22

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION- ELECTRONIC DELIVERY- 8/17/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: NOT ATTACHED- NOTICE OF SERVICE PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Alexis Rosenberg; Amount: -65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: ADDENDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENBERG , ALEXIS