This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 07/17/2022 at 17:10:38 (UTC).

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLCvs.PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLCvs PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian Sandor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************39-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian Sandor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLC A/A/O ASTRIDE REYNOLDS

COMPLETE CARE CENTERS, LLC

ASTRIDE REYNOLDS AAO

Defendant

PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANS KENNON

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Issued Summon to the Attorney

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Issued Summon to the Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Hans Kennon; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMPLETE CARE CENTERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Permanent General Assurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KENNON HANS