This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/23/2022 at 16:11:49 (UTC).

COLEMAN, BRENDA vs. ORLANDO FIRE DEPARTMENTet al.

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 COLEMAN, BRENDA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ORLANDO FIRE DEPARTMENT. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent Falcone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************94-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent Falcone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRENDA COLEMAN

Defendants

ORLANDO FIRE DEPARTMENT

AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE AMBULANCE SERVICE INC

AMR DBA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMANDA BRIGHT

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Petition

Petition

Complaint

Complaint

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Motion or Petition to Reopen Case

Motion or Petition to Reopen Case

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: AMR

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: AMR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion or Petition to Reopen Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Per Admin Order No. 2021-04, a Standing Case Management Plan/Order for Streamlined or General civil cases must be submitted before summonses can be issued. Please resubmit the proposed summons along with the Case management Order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: BRIGHT, AMANDA ANDERSON; Amount: -10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: no sum fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Gordon Fenderson; Amount: -42.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 42.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Medical Response Ambulance Service, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMANDA BRIGHT