This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 02/25/2022 at 10:14:19 (UTC).

COASTAL NEUROLOGY, INC.vs.STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 COASTAL NEUROLOGY, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian F Duckworth and Andrew L Cameron. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************35-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Brian F Duckworth

Andrew L Cameron

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COASTAL NEUROLOGY, INC.

TERRI HUDSON AAO

COASTAL NEUROLOGY PAIN & NEUROLOGY CENTER DBA

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ERIC DEMING

Defendant Attorney

DAVID GAGNON

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim; Comments: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Addendum to

Addendum to

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: Electronic Delivery 11/24/21 State Farm Mutual Automotive Insurance Company

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: Electronic Delivery 11/24/21 State Farm Mutual Automotive Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Eric Deming; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Comments: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COASTAL NEUROLOGY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant