This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/20/2021 at 15:43:03 (UTC).

COASTAL NEUROLOGY, INC. vs. ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 COASTAL NEUROLOGY, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael Deen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************89-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Michael Deen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COASTAL NEUROLOGY, INC.

CLARENCE MULLINS AAO

COASTAL NEUROLOGY PAIN & NEUROLOGY CENTERS DBA

Defendant

ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JESSICA PICKERAL

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: ELECTRONIC DELIVERY on Friday, September 24, 2021

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: ELECTRONIC DELIVERY on Friday, September 24, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Jessica Pickeral; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COASTAL NEUROLOGY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JESSICA PICKERAL