This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 01/21/2022 at 16:09:46 (UTC).

CLOUD CHIROPRACTIC AND REHABILITATION CENTER vs. STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 CLOUD CHIROPRACTIC AND REHABILITATION CENTER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian F Duckworth and Andrew L Cameron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************99-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Brian F Duckworth

Andrew L Cameron

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CLOUD CHIROPRACTIC AND REHABILITATION CENTER

SHIRLEY THOMAS AAO

Defendant

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY BLACKBURN

Defendant Attorney

VALENCIA PERCY FLAKES

 

Court Documents

Motion

Motion; Comments: for Leave to Serve Additional Interrogatories Requests

Supplemental Interrogatories

Supplemental Interrogatories

Supplemental Interrogatories

Supplemental Interrogatories

Supplemental Interrogatories

Supplemental Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Motion

Motion; Comments: for Leave to Serve Additional Admissions Requests

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: DEFT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Comments: for Leave to Serve Additional Interrogatories Requests

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSupplemental Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSupplemental Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSupplemental Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Comments: for Leave to Serve Additional Admissions Requests

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: RTR LAW; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLOUD CHIROPRACTIC AND REHABILITATION CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant