This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 01/18/2022 at 16:10:22 (UTC).

CLERMONT RADIOLOGY LLC vs. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 CLERMONT RADIOLOGY LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************06-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CLERMONT RADIOLOGY LLC

NANCY ANDRADE AAO

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DIANA ARTEAGA

ABRAHAM OVADIA

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Need the Streamlined/General plan/order to issue the proposed sumons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Ovadia Law Group, P.A.; Amount: -65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLERMONT RADIOLOGY LLC AAO KIERSTAN HOBSON is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARTEAGA, DIANA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OVADIA, ABRAHAM