Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 05/21/2021 at 15:44:22 (UTC).

CLERMONT CHIROPRACTIC LIFE CENTER, P.A. vs. PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 CLERMONT CHIROPRACTIC LIFE CENTER, P A filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Carly S Wish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************89-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Carly S Wish

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CLERMONT CHIROPRACTIC LIFE CENTER, P.A.

KEVIN FREEHILL AAO

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JESSICA PICKERAL

Defendant Attorney

BRANDON ETTELMAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL- DEFT

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION-PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Summons Issued

Summons Issued; Comments: emailed to attorney

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: Addendum

Notice of Compliance

Notice of Compliance; Comments: and Designation of Email Address(es)

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: (First)

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL- DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION-PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued; Comments: emailed to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Jessica Pickeral; Amount: -90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: Addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Compliance; Comments: and Designation of Email Address(es)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: (First)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLERMONT CHIROPRACTIC LIFE CENTER PA is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ETTELMAN BRANDON