This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/16/2019 at 15:42:11 (UTC).

CLERMONT CHIROPRACTIC LIFE CENTER PA vs. PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/15/2019 CLERMONT CHIROPRACTIC LIFE CENTER PA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Evellen H Jewett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************83-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Evellen H Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CLERMONT CHIROPRACTIC LIFE CENTER, P.A. A/A/O ELISABETH HALL

ELISABETH HALL AAO

CLERMONT CHIROPRACTIC LIFE CENTER PA

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JESSICA PICKERAL

 

Court Documents

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Summary of Proceedings

Summary of Proceedings

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY, DONNA MOCH

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Emailed to Atty

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summary of Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • HEARING - Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY, DONNA MOCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Emailed to Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Jessica Pickeral; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less