This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/11/2021 at 22:08:44 (UTC).

CLARK, EUGENIA DENISE vs. CLARK, MICHAEL ANDRE

Case Summary

On 06/19/2020 CLARK, EUGENIA DENISE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CLARK, MICHAEL ANDRE. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Diana M. Tennis. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************82-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Diana M. Tennis

 

Party Details

Petitioner

EUGENIA DENISE CLARK

Respondent

MICHAEL ANDRE CLARK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JOSHUA BACHMAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketDisposition Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketMotion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: GrayRobinson, P.A.; Amount: -418.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 418.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketExhibit(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Social Security

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketPetition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketAmended Administrative Temporary Order Provided to Customer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOSHUA BACHMAN