This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/03/2019 at 15:33:22 (UTC).

CISNERO MORALES, AMAURYet al. vs. SOUTHERN FIDELITY PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INC

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 CISNERO MORALES, AMAURY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SOUTHERN FIDELITY PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Chad K Alvaro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************65-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Chad K Alvaro

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMAURY CISNERO MORALES

YAMILA PEREA PUPO

Defendant

SOUTHERN FIDELITY PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALEXANDRA RAMON

Defendant Attorney

JACQUELINE ALASTRA

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: JURY TRIAL

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: TO COUNT I FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT AND MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS DESIGNATION

Complaint

Complaint

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: TO COUNT I FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT AND MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Alexandra Ramon; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less