This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 02/22/2022 at 07:04:10 (UTC).

CHIROMED INJURY CENTER PA vs. INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 CHIROMED INJURY CENTER PA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian Sandor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************58-O

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian Sandor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHIROMED INJURY CENTER PA

ANA CARIOCA AAO

Defendant

INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY BLACKBURN

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: SUPPLEMENTAL

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: SUPPLEMENTAL

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: SUPPLEMENTAL

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: SUPP REG RALATEDNESS

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: SUPPLEMENTAL REG REASONABLENESS

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Comments: BY PLAINTIFF; FOR LEAVE TO SERVE ADDITIONAL INTERROGATORIES REQUESTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Comments: BY PLAINTIFF; FOR LEAVE TO SERVE ADDITIONAL ADMISSIONS REQUESTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: MARIA COLL; Amount: -90.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less