This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 03/06/2023 at 00:09:11 (UTC).

CHIROMED INJURY CENTER PA vs. INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/02/2022 CHIROMED INJURY CENTER PA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth Gibson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************86-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth Gibson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHIROMED INJURY CENTER PA

ANA CARIOCA AAO

Defendant

INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

Defendant Attorney

JOHN ECKARD

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Addendum to

Addendum to

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY- ELECTRONIC DELIVERY- 9/13/2022

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: Designation of Primary Electronic Service

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Privilege Log

Privilege Log

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrivilege Log

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: Designation of Primary Electronic Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY- ELECTRONIC DELIVERY- 9/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Landau Associates, P.A.; Amount: -65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less